Global Patent Index - EP 1002487 A2

EP 1002487 A2 2000-05-24 - Curtain

Title (en)

Curtain

Title (de)

Vorhang

Title (fr)

Rideau

Publication

EP 1002487 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123411 A

Priority

  • DE 29820857 U
  • DE 19920105 A
  • DE 19921468 A

Abstract (en)

The curtain (1) is formed in two or more individual parts. Along at least one edge of each part are one or more suspension devices which enable the parts (10,20,30,40) to be suspended next to, over, on or in one another. Each individual part along at least one edge has one or more cord loops and/or one or more loops with at least one button hole. On its front side and its rear side (13,23,33,43), each part has one or more buttons. For fixture of a part to a rod, the cord loops or loops are wound around the rod and are attached to at least one button. The front and rear buttons are arranged opposite to one another. Each cord loop is accurately arranged over a front and/or rear button.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Vorhang (1) bestehend aus zwei oder mehr Einzelteilen (10, 20, 30, 40, 110, 120, 130, 140). Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß jedes Einzelteil (10, 20, 30, 40, 110, 120, 130, 140) entlang mindestens einer Kante (11, 21, 31, 41, 111, 112, 113, 114) ein oder mehrere Aufhängvorrichtungen aufweist, wobei die Einzelteile (10, 20, 30, 40, 110, 120, 130, 140) mittels der Aufhängvorrichtungen nebeneinander, übereinander, aneinander oder ineinander aufgehängt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 23/02; A47H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 13/00 (2006.01); A47H 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 23/02 (2013.01); A47H 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002487 A2 20000524; EP 1002487 A3 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI