Global Patent Index - EP 1002493 A2

EP 1002493 A2 2000-05-24 - Dust filter

Title (en)

Dust filter

Title (de)

Staubfilterbeutel

Title (fr)

Filtre à poussière

Publication

EP 1002493 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115742 A

Priority

DE 29820867 U

Abstract (en)

The duster filter bag has a bag casing (2) with two flat walls (4, 5) opposed to each other, extending in the bag longitudinal direction and two connecting folding walls (6, 7) connecting the flat walls at the bag sides with each other. The folding walls have respectively a main fold (8, 9) pointing inwards. The folding walls, at least at one side of the main folds (8, 9) between these and the facing flat wall, have at least one auxiliary fold (36-39) parallel to the main folds (8, 9). Two auxiliary limbs (40-47) connected with each other at an auxiliary fold apex (48-51) running inwards. Which at the end of the facing side wall edge (29, 30) run together at the solid base. So that with the extension of the aux. limbs (40-47) are bent, forming flat wall extensions at the flat wall folded edges (27, 28), at the respective flat wall floor ends (23, 24) and form reinforcements of the flat wall floor ends.

Abstract (de)

Ein Staubfilterbeutel (1) aus flexiblem, faltbarem Filtermaterial weist einen Beutelmantel (2) mit zwei einander entgegengesetzten Flachwänden (4, 5) und zwei die Flachwände (4, 5) verbindenden, jeweils eine Hauptfalte (8, 9) bildenden Faltwänden (6, 7) auf, so daß sich der Beutel beim Betrieb aus einer flachen Ausgangsgestalt unter Auffalten der Faltwände (6, 7) aufbläht. An den Beutelmantel (2) ist ein Klotzboden (17) einstückig angesetzt, der zwei jeweils einer Flachwand (4, 5) zugewandte, über eine Flachwand-Faltkante (27, 28) an die jeweilige Flachwand (4, 5) angesetzte Flachwand-Bodenpartien (23, 24) und zwei jeweils einer Faltwand (6, 7) zugewandte, an einen die jeweilige Hauptfalte (8, 9) endseitig abschließenden, dreieckigen Übergangsbereich (31, 32) der betreffenden Faltwand (6, 7) angesetzte Faltwand-Bodenpartien (25, 26) aufweist. Die Faltwände (6, 7) enthalten mindestens zu einer Seite der Hauptfalte (8, 9) mindestens eine Zusatzfalte (36 bis 39) mit zwei an einem innen verlaufenden Zusatzfaltenscheitel (48 bis 51) miteinander verbundenen Zusatzfaltenschenkeln (40 bis 47), die an dem Klotzboden (17) zugewandten Ende an der zugewandten Flachwand-Faltkante (29, 30) zusammenlaufen. Verlängerungen der Zusatzfaltenschenkel (40 bis 47) sind gemeinsam mit einer die jeweilige Flachwand-Bodenpartie (23, 24) bildenden Flachwandverlängerung an der Flachwand-Faltkante (27, 28) abgebogen und bilden Verstärkungen der Flachwand-Bodenpartie (23, 24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820867 U1 19990121; EP 1002493 A2 20000524; EP 1002493 A3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061220

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060809

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI