Global Patent Index - EP 1002558 A2

EP 1002558 A2 2000-05-24 - Device and method for setting up pins on a bowling alley

Title (en)

Device and method for setting up pins on a bowling alley

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufstellen von Kegeln auf einer Kegelbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour disposer des quilles sur une piste de quilles

Publication

EP 1002558 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120822 A

Priority

DE 19853081 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves optically detecting at least part of the skittle field (1) with least one image acquisition device (5). Fallen and/or standing skittles (2) are detected using image data; the recorded image data are evaluated in an image processor and compared with defined image data to control a skittle placement arrangement (10) which picks up the skittles and positions them in the skittle field or in a skittle depot. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for Placing skittles on a skittle alley.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Aufstellen von Kegeln auf einer Kegel- oder Bowlingbahn vorgesehen, wobei zumindest ein Teil des Kegelfeldes mittels wenigstens einer Bildaufzeichnungseinrichtung optisch abgetastet wird, gefallene und/oder stehengebliebene Kegel durch Bilddaten erfaßt werden, die aufgezeichneten Bilddaten in einer Bildverarbeitungseinrichtung verarbeitet und mit vorgegebenen Bilddaten verglichen werden, worauf von einer Steuereinrichtung eine Kegelaufstelleinrichtung angesteuert wird, mittels der die Kegel aufgenommen und auf dem Kegelfeld oder in einem Kegeldepot positioniert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63D 5/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002558 A2 20000524; EP 1002558 A3 20010228; DE 19853081 C1 20000727; HR P990356 A2 20001231; PL 336570 A1 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040429

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991022;SI PAYMENT 19991022

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19991022;SI PAYMENT 19991022

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19991022;SI PAYMENT 19991022