Global patent index - EP 1002558 A3

EP 1002558 A3 2001-02-28 - Device and method for setting up pins on a bowling alley

Title (en)

Device and method for setting up pins on a bowling alley

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufstellen von Kegeln auf einer Kegelbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour disposer des quilles sur une piste de quilles

Publication

EP 1002558 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120822 A

Priority

DE 19853081 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002558A2] The method involves optically detecting at least part of the skittle field (1) with least one image acquisition device (5). Fallen and/or standing skittles (2) are detected using image data; the recorded image data are evaluated in an image processor and compared with defined image data to control a skittle placement arrangement (10) which picks up the skittles and positions them in the skittle field or in a skittle depot. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for Placing skittles on a skittle alley.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63D 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002558 A2 20000524; EP 1002558 A3 20010228; DE 19853081 C1 20000727; HR P990356 A2 20001231; PL 336570 A1 20000522

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040429

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19991022;SI PAYMENT 19991022

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19991022;SI PAYMENT 19991022

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19991022;SI PAYMENT 19991022