Global patent index - EP 1002591 A2

EP 1002591 A2 2000-05-24 - Apparatus for stretch-bending from metal rods or profiles

Title (en)

Apparatus for stretch-bending from metal rods or profiles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Streckbiegen von Metallstäben oder -profilen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le pliage par étirage de barres ou profilés métalliques

Publication

EP 1002591 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112308 A

Priority

DE 19853294 A

Abstract (en)

The equipment comprises a stretch plate for bending tools on which two bending arms are pivotable around axes parallel to each other and orthogonal to the plate plane. On the bending arms are tension devices for fixing the bar or profile to be bent. From the plate extends a counter bearing on which the bar or profile supports. On the stretch plate (2) in the pivot area of each bending arm (4) is a tooth segment forming a part circular arc and a pinion (9) driven by a drive (8) is held rotatably at a distance from its pivot axis (3). The pinion engages the tooth segment.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Vorrichtung zum Streckbiegen von geraden Metallstäben oder -profilen, bestehend aus einer Aufspannplatte für die Biegewerkzeuge, zwei an der Aufspannplatte um zueinander parallele orthogonal zur Plattenebene der Aufspannplatte gerichtete Achsen schwenkbare Biegearme, an den Biegearmen gehalterte Spannmittel zur Fixierung des zu biegenden Stabes oder Profiles, sowie von der Aufspannplatte abragendem Gegenlager, an dem der zu biegende Stab beziehungsweise das zu biegende Profil abstützbar ist, wobei die Biegearme gegenläufig zueinander mittels Stellmitteln schwenkbar sind, zu schaffen, die mit einfachen Mitteln eine Biegung von Metallstäben oder -profilen ermöglicht, wobei das Biegemoment im wesentlichen konstant gehalten werden kann, wird vorgeschlagen, daß an der Aufspannplatte (2) im Schwenkbereich eines jeden Biegearmes (4) ein einen Teilkreisbogen bildendes Zahnsegment (7) und am Biegearm (4) mit Abstand von seiner Schwenkachse (3) ein mittels eines Antriebes (8) antreibbares Ritzel (9) drehbar gehaltert ist, das mit dem Zahnsegment (7) in Eingriff ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 7/022; B21D 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 25/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002591 A2 20000524; EP 1002591 A3 20021218; DE 19853294 A1 20000531

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DURA AUTOMOTIVE PLETTENBERG ENTWICKLUNGS- UND VERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21D 11/02 A, 7B 21D 25/02 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI