Global patent index - EP 1002592 A2

EP 1002592 A2 2000-05-24 - Wire bending machine, in particular for bending steel reinforcing wires

Title (en)

Wire bending machine, in particular for bending steel reinforcing wires

Title (de)

Drahtbiegemaschine, insbesondere zum Biegen von Baustahldrähten

Title (fr)

Machine de cintrage de fil, en particulier pour cintrer des fers pour béton armé

Publication

EP 1002592 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890358 A

Priority

AT 193798 A

Abstract (en)

The machine (1) particularly for bending building steel wires has one or two longitudinally movable bending slides (3) equipped with a bending head (4). Two bending mandrels (6,7) form part of the bending head and form between them an insert gap. A bending arm (8) with a bending pin (9) is pivotably adjustable around a pivot axis running in the area of the insert gap. A wire clamp forming part of the bending head has two clamp jaws movable crossways to the gap direction.

Abstract (de)

Eine Drahtbiegemaschine (1) ist mit ein oder zwei längsverfahrbaren, einen Biegekopf (4) aufnehmenden Biegeschlitten (3) ausgestattet, wobei der Biegekopf (4) zwei zwischen sich einen Einlegespalt (5) freilassende Biegedorne (6, 7) sowie einen um eine dornachsparallele, im Bereich des Einlegespaltes (5) verlaufende Schwenkachse (S) schwenkverstellbaren Biegearm (8) mit einem Biegezapfen (9) und eine Drahtklemme (10) mit zwei quer zur Spaltrichtung bewegbaren Klemmbacken (11, 12) aufweist. Um mit gleichbleibenden Biegewerkzeugen Drahtstücke unterschiedlichen Durchmessers biegen und dabei die verschiedensten Biegeformen erreichen zu können, umfassen die beiden Biegedorne (6, 7) jeweils wenigstens zwei zur Längsmittelebene (E) des Einlegespaltes (5) symmetrisch angeordnete und eine gemeinsame, den Einlegespalt (5) begrenzende Tangentialebene (T6, T7) bestimmende Dornabschnitte (61, 62, 63; 71, 72, 73) unterschiedlichen Durchmessers (D1, D2, D3), bildet vorzugsweise auch der Biegezapfen (9) den Dornabschnitten in Anzahl, Höhe und Durchmesser gleiche Zapfenabschnitte (91, 92, 93), wobei die Biegedorne (6, 7) und gegebenenfalls der Schwenkarm (8) mit dem Biegezapfen (9) in Achsrichtung gegenüber der achsnormalen Biegeebene (B) höhenverstellbar gelagert sind, und ist die Drahtklemme (10) aus einer Offenstellung mit auf die Tangentialebenen (T6, T7) ausgerichteten Klemmbacken (11, 12) in Abhängigkeit vom Biegen um den einen oder anderen Biegedorn (6, 7) durch wahlweises Querbewegen der diesem Biegedorn jeweils gegenüberliegenden Klemmbacke (11, 12) betätigbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 11/12; B21D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 11/12 (2006.01); B21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 1/02 (2013.01); B21D 11/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002592 A2 20000524; EP 1002592 A3 20011212; EP 1002592 B1 20030319; AT 234694 T 20030415; AT 406744 B 20000825; AT A193798 A 20000115; DE 59904609 D1 20030424

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1002592E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904609

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020517

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21D 11/12 A, 7B 21F 1/00 B, 7B 21D 7/022 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI