Global Patent Index - EP 1002594 A3

EP 1002594 A3 2001-03-28 - Method and device for forming a workpiece

Title (en)

Method and device for forming a workpiece

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Umformen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dipositif pour former une pièce

Publication

EP 1002594 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122081 A

Priority

DE 19853365 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002594A2] Process for deforming workpieces comprises using a local energy input to the workpiece (3) outside of the time prescribed for deforming a required workpiece in the deforming apparatus. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for carrying out the deforming process comprising a processing device (10) with local energy input arranged on a transporting device (5) for the workpiece (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/05; B23K 26/00; B21D 22/02; B21D 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/05 (2013.01); Y10T 29/51 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5124 (2013.01); Y10T 29/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002594 A2 20000524; EP 1002594 A3 20010328; DE 19853365 A1 20000525; US 6775888 B1 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030624

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 43/05 A, 7B 23K 26/00 B, 7B 21D 22/02 B, 7B 21D 35/00 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI