Global Patent Index - EP 1002600 A2

EP 1002600 A2 2000-05-24 - Submerged nozzle for feeding molten metal into a mould for the continuous casting of thin material

Title (en)

Submerged nozzle for feeding molten metal into a mould for the continuous casting of thin material

Title (de)

Tauchgiessrohr zum Einleiten von Schmelze in eine Kokille zum Stranggiessen insbesondere von Flachprodukten

Title (fr)

Tube plongeur pour introduire un métal fondu, dans une coquille pour la coulée en continue de plaques fines

Publication

EP 1002600 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122176 A

Priority

  • DE 19853723 A
  • DE 19908346 A

Abstract (en)

The contour element is formed of a combination of a sturdy base element (10) connecting opposite wall regions at a height (H1) and flow distributors (12) at a height (H2) in a direction of the X-axis protruding from the wall directions into the pouring piece (11) of the flow channel without solid connection to the opposite-lying wall regions. Immersion pouring spout (1) used in continuous casting has a pouring piece (11) formed as flow channel and made up of a contour element (10, 12) and opposite-lying outlet openings (8, 8') in the direction of the narrow side walls (15). The contour element is formed of a combination of a sturdy base element (10) connecting opposite wall regions at a height (H1) and flow distributors (12) at a height (H2) in a direction of the X-axis protruding from the wall directions into the pouring piece (11) of the flow channel without solid connection to the opposite-lying wall regions.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Tauchgießrohr 1 zum Einleiten von Schmelze, insbesondere Stahlschmelze, aus einem Gieß- oder Zwischenbehälter 3 in eine mit Breitseiten- 14 und Schmalseitenwänden 15 ausgebildete Kokille 5 zum Stranggießen von insbesondere Flachprodukten. Das Tauchgießrohr 1 weist ein als Strömungskanal ausgebildetes Rohrstück 11 auf, welches mit einem Konturelement 10, 12 und wenigstens zwei in Richtung der Schmalseitenwände 15 gegenüberliegenden Austrittsöffnungen (8, 8') ausgebildet ist. Das Konturelement ist mit einer fließend ineinander übergehenden Kombination eines massiven, gegenüberliegende Wandbereiche verbindenden Bodenelements 10 mit der Höhe H1 und oberhalb desselben angeordneten Strömungsteilern 12 mit in Richtung der X-Achse vorgesehener Höhe H2 ausgebildet, die ausgehend von den Wandbereichen in das Rohrstück 11 des Strömungskanals hineinragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10; B22D 41/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002600 A2 20000524; EP 1002600 A3 20010404; EP 1002600 B1 20040121; AT 258088 T 20040215; ES 2214796 T3 20040916

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59908363

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908363

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131106

2015-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150507

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131105

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 258088 T

- Effective date: 20131105

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-05-06 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 05/03 PAGES: 237 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE.

2005-01-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214796 T3

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908363 P 20040226

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI