Global Patent Index - EP 1002602 A1

EP 1002602 A1 2000-05-24 - Device and method for the fabrication of an engine block

Title (en)

Device and method for the fabrication of an engine block

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren für die Herstellung eines Motorblocks

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la fabrication d'un bloc moteur

Publication

EP 1002602 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110195 A

Priority

DE 19853803 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19853803C1] A mold has seating surfaces (13, 14) for the ends of the cylinder liners. At least one of the seating surfaces is conical, with the cone angle chosen so that the ends of the cylinder liners (5) undergoing thermal expansion during preparation and casting remain pressed against these seating surfaces. Also claimed is a method for producing such an engine block.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung für die Herstellung eines Motorblocks mit zum Verbund mit Gußmaterial in eine Gießform einbezogenen, jeweils an einem Sitz mit gehalterten Zylinderlaufbüchsen, wobei der Sitz an den Büchsenenden angreifende Sitzflächen aufweist, sowie ein entsprechendes Verfahren für die Herstellung eines Motorblocks. Erfindungsgemäß ist wenigstens eine der Sitzflächen konisch derart ausgebildet, daß bei Wärmeausdehnung der Zylinderlaufbüchsen während des Gießens die Büchsenenden in Anlage gegen die Sitzflächen verbleiben. Vorzugsweise sind die Sitzflächen (13,14) konisch mit einem Neigungswinkel 1 bzw. 2 zur Büchsenachse ausgebildet, wobei die Bedingung tan 1 + tan 2 = l/r erfüllt ist, worin l die sich zwischen Angriffspunkten an den Sitzflächen erstreckende Büchsenlänge und r den zugehörigen Radius bezeichnen. Durch diese Erfindungslösung ist gewährleistet, daß die Zylinderlaufbüchsen bei Wärmeausdehnung während des Gießvorgangs stets in ihrem Sitz unter Beibehaltung ihrer gewünschten Position arretiert sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/0009 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853803 C1 20000330; AT 277706 T 20041015; DK 1002602 T3 20050124; EP 1002602 A1 20000524; EP 1002602 B1 20040929; ES 2230767 T3 20050501; SI 1002602 T1 20050430; US 6363995 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090226

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080526

2009-01-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYDRO ALUMINIUM ALUCAST G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-15 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYDRO ALUMINIUM ALUCAST G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230767 T3

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-01-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2004-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: MK SI

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM ALUCAST GMBH

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-01-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: MK PAYMENT 20001118;SI PAYMENT 20001118

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001118

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI