Global Patent Index - EP 1002644 A2

EP 1002644 A2 2000-05-24 - Production of support for lithographic printing plate.

Title (en)

Production of support for lithographic printing plate.

Title (de)

Herstellung eines Trägers für Flachdruckplatte

Title (fr)

Production d'un support pour plaque d'impression lithographique

Publication

EP 1002644 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99203617 A

Priority

GB 9825043 A

Abstract (en)

A process is provided for the manufacture of a support for a lithographic printing plate precursor, the process comprising treating at least one surface of a metallic substrate with an aqueous solution comprising a salt of a metal from Group IB, IIB, IVA, IVB, VB, VIA, VIB, VIIB or VIII of the Periodic Table whilst applying a constant voltage or constant current. Methods are also disclosed for the manufacture of lithographic printing plate precursors which provide plates showing good resistance to abrasion, corrosion, staining and scumming, both on development and on press. Additionally, the plates display excellent coating adhesion in image areas, together with very good exposure latitude and solvent resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10; B41N 1/08; C25D 11/06; C25D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/00 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); C25D 11/06 (2006.01); C25D 11/08 (2006.01); C25D 11/12 (2006.01); C25D 11/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/20 (2013.01); C25D 11/06 (2013.01); C25D 11/08 (2013.01); C25D 11/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2343681 A 20000517; GB 9925555 D0 19991229; DE 69935488 D1 20070426; DE 69935488 T2 20071129; EP 1002644 A2 20000524; EP 1002644 A3 20040114; EP 1002644 B1 20070314; GB 9825043 D0 19990113; JP 2000147751 A 20000526

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69935488

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-06-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120601

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101007

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071217

2007-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935488 P 20070426

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2007-03-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41C 1/10 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41N 1/08 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 11/06 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 11/12 B

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI