Global Patent Index - EP 1002648 A1

EP 1002648 A1 2000-05-24 - Flushing position controller incorporated in ink-jet recording apparatus and flushing method used for the same

Title (en)

Flushing position controller incorporated in ink-jet recording apparatus and flushing method used for the same

Title (de)

In einem Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät eingebauter Spülpositionsregler und Spülverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Commande de position de rinçage incorporé dans un appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et méthode de rinçage utilisé à cet effet

Publication

EP 1002648 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99123128 A

Priority

  • JP 33102698 A
  • JP 33801598 A
  • JP 35906898 A
  • JP 34307998 A
  • JP 8692199 A

Abstract (en)

Flushing regions for receiving ink droplets to be ejected when flushing signal is supplied to a recording head are provided in both of non-print regions situated at both sides of print region in order to prevent throughput during the flushing operation from deteriorating. A guide member having a slant surface is disposed between the recording head and an ink absorbing member to which the ink landed on the slant surface flows in order to reduce in size of the ink absorbing member. A porous sheet member closely faced to nozzle orifices of the recording head for receiving the ink droplets ejected therefrom is provided in order to prevent undesired mist of fine ink droplets from generating. A plurality of plate members closely faced to the nozzle orifices are provided at a predetermined angle with respect to the flight direction of the ink droplets in order to prevent the undesired mist from generating. The flushing operation is performed so as to prevent solidification of the ejected ink. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1721 (2013.01); B41J 2/16508 (2013.01); B41J 2002/1728 (2013.01); B41J 2002/1742 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002648 A1 20000524; EP 1982836 A2 20081022; EP 1982836 A3 20090128

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090129

2008-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080214

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI