Global Patent Index - EP 1002715 A2

EP 1002715 A2 2000-05-24 - Adjustable foundation for machine units in ships

Title (en)

Adjustable foundation for machine units in ships

Title (de)

Justierbares Fundament für Maschineneinheiten auf Schiffen

Title (fr)

Fondation réglable pour machines de bateaux

Publication

EP 1002715 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99660180 A

Priority

FI 982516 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an adjustable foundation for aligning a machine unit in the correct height position in ships and particularly on ship decks. The foundation (30) comprises a bottom sleeve (2, 7), which is by a premade joint weld (14) made part of the ship's deck structure (22), as well as a top sleeve (1, 6), whereto the fastening brackets (20) of the machine unit are secured. The sleeves are arranged in a nested fashion and are telescopically adjustable with respect to each other in the shifting direction (D1). In addition, the top sleeve (1, 6) includes at least one vertical screw member (5) that extends from the top part (P1) of the top sleeve to the interior (P2) of the bottom sleeve and supports against the deck structure. After the height alignment, the top sleeve and the bottom sleeve can be locked together by joint welds (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 3/70 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002715 A2 20000524; EP 1002715 A3 20020227; EP 1002715 B1 20040331; CN 1101325 C 20030212; CN 1257809 A 20000628; DE 69915981 D1 20040506; DE 69915981 T2 20050310; DK 1002715 T3 20040726; ES 2243042 T3 20051116; FI 109780 B 20021015; FI 982516 A0 19981120; FI 982516 A 20000521; KR 100522467 B1 20051019; KR 20000052364 A 20000825

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2243042

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-07-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915981

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES IT

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-11-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES IT

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI