Global Patent Index - EP 1002720 A2

EP 1002720 A2 2000-05-24 - Device for connecting the ends of band ties in tying machines

Title (en)

Device for connecting the ends of band ties in tying machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden der Umschnürungsbandenden an Umschnürungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour raccorder les extrémités d'un lien de cerclage dans des machines de cerclage

Publication

EP 1002720 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120945 A

Priority

  • DE 19853722 A
  • DE 19913405 A
  • DE 19920797 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a binding tape guide and a clamping and connecting station (20) with clamping and closure rods (29) forced by springs (37) against a camshaft (34), which moves the rods into working and release positions. The springs are coil springs and the camshaft engages a central region of the clamping and closure rods.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Verbinden der Umschnürungsbandenden an Umschnürungsmaschinen, mit einer Umschnürungsband-Führung und einer Klemm- und Verbindungsstation, wobei in der Verbindungsstation Klemm- und Verschlußstempel (29) angeordnet sind, die mittels Federn (37) gegen die Klemm- und Verschlußstempel (29) in eine Arbeits- und Freigabeposition bewegende Nockenwelle vorgespannt sind, und schlägt zur Erzielung einer hinsichtlich Aufbau und Arbeitsweise vorteilhaften Vorrichtung vor, daß die Federn Druckfedern (37) sind und die Nockenwelle in einem mittleren Bereich von Klemm- und Verschlußstempel (29) angreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/32; B65B 13/18; B65B 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/18 (2006.01); B65B 13/22 (2006.01); B65B 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/322 (2013.01); B65B 13/18 (2013.01); B65B 13/22 (2013.01); B65B 13/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4776905 A 19881011 - CHEUNG NELSON [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002720 A2 20000524; EP 1002720 A3 20000927; EP 1002720 B1 20050817; AT 302141 T 20050915; ES 2245494 T3 20060101

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151102

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151104

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SIAT S.P.A., IT

- Document: AT 302141 T

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIAT S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANDER GMBH & CO. KG, 42285 WUPPERTAL, DE

- Document: DE 59912425

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912425

- Representative's name: BIRD & BIRD LLP, DE

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912425

- Representative's name: RECHTSANWAELTE BIRD & BIRD LLP, DE

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-03-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912425

- Representative's name: BIRD & BIRD LLP, DE

2014-02-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SIAT S.P.A., IT

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-02-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SIAT S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140116 AND 20140122

2014-02-12 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140128

2014-01-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG INHABER

2013-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL AND PARTN, CH

2013-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIAT S.P.A., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANDER GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

2006-09-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 17.08.2006 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2006-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-01-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060117

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245494 T3

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-11-02 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912425 P 20050922

2005-09-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL RO SI

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANDER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031202

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010223;RO PAYMENT 20010223;SI PAYMENT 20010223

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIE ERFINDER HABEN AUF IHRE NENNUNG VERZICHTET

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI