Global Patent Index - EP 1002729 A1

EP 1002729 A1 2000-05-24 - Method and device for cutting tie bands of stacks or packs of labels and/or blanks

Title (en)

Method and device for cutting tie bands of stacks or packs of labels and/or blanks

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Umreifungsbändern für Stapel von Etiketten oder Zuschnitten

Title (fr)

Proçédé et dispositif pour couper des liens de piles d'étiquettes ou de flans

Publication

EP 1002729 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120338 A

Priority

IT SV980066 A

Abstract (en)

Method of cutting the tie bands of bundles or stacks of labels in which the band (F) is cut according to a transversal cutting line (11,111) and in which before the cut of the band (F) is carried out the same is moved away from the stack (P) in the area where the cut takes place, characterized by the fact that the moving away of the band (F) in the cutting area of the same is obtained by lifting the band from the bundle or stack (P) of blanks in direction of the cutting knife (11,111). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 69/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A24C (2006.01); B65B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT SV980021 A 19980409

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002729 A1 20000524; IT 1305424 B1 20010504; IT SV980066 A1 20000519; IT SV980066 D0 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUTTING TIE BANDS OF STACKS OR PACKS OF LABELS AND/OR BLANKS

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB S.P.A.

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI