Global Patent Index - EP 1002736 A2

EP 1002736 A2 2000-05-24 - Device for dispensing liquid substances onto the skin

Title (en)

Device for dispensing liquid substances onto the skin

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen flüssiger Medien auf die Haut

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour distribuer des produits liquides sur la peau

Publication

EP 1002736 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119500 A

Priority

DE 19853253 A

Abstract (en)

The spreader (4) comprises a holder (41) fitted onto the container (1) and a moveable carrier (42), on top of the spray valve (3), accepting a distribution head (43). The valve (3) is opened by light axial (31) pressure or tilting, spraying the inside of the distributor with some of the contents. The distribution head is preferably made of a porous material.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen flüssiger Medien auf die Haut, bestehend aus einem eine Flüssigkeit enthaltenden Behältnis, wobei das Behältnis aus einer Druckgaspackung mit einem Sprühventil gebildet ist, und einem an diesem Behältnis befestigten Auftragselement, dem die Flüssigkeit aus dem Behältnis zuführbar ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Auftragselement 4 aus einer auf dem Behälter 1 aufgesetzten Halterung 41 und aus einem beweglich gelagerten Trägerelement 42 besteht, das auf dem Sprühventil 3 aufliegt, das einen Verteilkopf 43 aufnimmt, welcher beim Auslösen des Sprühventils 3 mit dem Füllgut beaufschlagt wird, und das in der Halterung 41 im wesentlichen parallel zur Sprühventilachse 31 geführt werden kann, wobei eine Betätigung des Sprühventils 3 durch leichtes Andrücken oder Abkippen des Verteilkopfes 43 erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/42; A45D 34/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/285 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002736 A2 20000524; EP 1002736 A3 20010711; DE 19853253 A1 20000525; US 6347899 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021127

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 47/42 A, 7A 45D 34/04 B, 7B 65D 83/14 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI