Global Patent Index - EP 1002738 A2

EP 1002738 A2 2000-05-24 - Storage and transport unit for insulating elements

Title (en)

Storage and transport unit for insulating elements

Title (de)

Lager- und Transporteinheit für Dämmstoffelemente

Title (fr)

Dispositif de stockage et de rangement pour éléments d'isolation thermique

Publication

EP 1002738 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122205 A

Priority

  • DE 19853370 A
  • DE 19858201 A
  • DE 19861057 A

Abstract (en)

A storage and transport unit consists of a stack of plate shaped insulating material elements made of mineral fibers, and a water porous sleeve in the form of a film or membrane which covers the top of the stack, the side walls and the base. A storage and transport unit consists of a stack of plate shaped insulating material elements made of mineral fibers, especially rock wool, and a sleeve which covers the top of the stack, the side walls and the base. The sleeve (16) consists of a water vapor porous material in the form of a film, fleece or membrane, and the sleeve has support members (4,5) which act as spacers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Lager- und Transporteinheit bestehend aus zumindest einem Stapel (1) plattenförmiger Dämmstoffelemente (2, 3) aus Mineralfasern, insbesondere Steinwolle- und oder Glasfasern und einer Umhüllung (16), welche zumindest an der Oberfläche und den Seitenflächen des Stapels (1) und vorzugsweise auch an der Unterseite des Stapels (1) anliegt. Um eine Lager- und Transporteinheit zu schaffen, bei der hydromechanische Belastungen der Dämmstoffelemente 2, 3 wesentlich reduziert oder vermieden werden, ist vorgesehen, daß die Umhüllung (16) aus einem wasserdampfdurchlässigen Material in Form einer Folie, eines Vliese und/oder einer Membran besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/16 (2006.01); B65D 85/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/0088 (2013.01); B65D 85/16 (2013.01); B65D 85/46 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002738 A2 20000524; EP 1002738 A3 20010307; EP 1002738 B1 20050518; AT 295809 T 20050615

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080117

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071101

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER G+H AG

- Effective date: 20060217

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912063 P 20050623

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 71/00 A, 7B 65D 85/16 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI