Global Patent Index - EP 1002738 A3

EP 1002738 A3 2001-03-07 - Storage and transport unit for insulating elements

Title (en)

Storage and transport unit for insulating elements

Title (de)

Lager- und Transporteinheit für Dämmstoffelemente

Title (fr)

Dispositif de stockage et de rangement pour éléments d'isolation thermique

Publication

EP 1002738 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122205 A

Priority

  • DE 19853370 A
  • DE 19858201 A
  • DE 19861057 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002738A2] A storage and transport unit consists of a stack of plate shaped insulating material elements made of mineral fibers, and a water porous sleeve in the form of a film or membrane which covers the top of the stack, the side walls and the base. A storage and transport unit consists of a stack of plate shaped insulating material elements made of mineral fibers, especially rock wool, and a sleeve which covers the top of the stack, the side walls and the base. The sleeve (16) consists of a water vapor porous material in the form of a film, fleece or membrane, and the sleeve has support members (4,5) which act as spacers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00; B65D 85/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/16 (2006.01); B65D 85/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/0088 (2013.01); B65D 85/16 (2013.01); B65D 85/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002738 A2 20000524; EP 1002738 A3 20010307; EP 1002738 B1 20050518; AT 295809 T 20050615

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20080117

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071101

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER G+H AG

- Effective date: 20060217

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912063

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65D 71/00 A, 7B 65D 85/16 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI