Global Patent Index - EP 1002739 A3

EP 1002739 A3 2000-10-25 - Storage and transport unit for insulating elements

Title (en)

Storage and transport unit for insulating elements

Title (de)

Lager- und Transporteinheit für Dämmstoffelemente

Title (fr)

Dispositif de stockage et de transport pour éléments d'isolation thermique

Publication

EP 1002739 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122288 A

Priority

  • DE 19853370 A
  • DE 19858201 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002739A2] A storage and transport unit consists of at least one stack of plate shaped insulation material elements made of mineral fibers, and a sleeve. The sleeve is located on the top surface, the sides and the bottom of the stack. The sleeve (16) consists of a material porous to water vapor and is in the form of a film, a fleece and/or a membrane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00; B65D 85/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/16 (2006.01); B65D 85/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/0088 (2013.01); B65D 85/16 (2013.01); B65D 85/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002739 A2 20000524; EP 1002739 A3 20001025; DE 19861057 A1 20000531; DE 19861057 C2 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080515

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001223

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 71/00 A, 7B 65D 85/16 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI