Global patent index - EP 1002743 A1

EP 1002743 A1 2000-05-24 - Infusion bag with one compartment, especially for tea and process for its manufacturing

Title (en)

Infusion bag with one compartment, especially for tea and process for its manufacturing

Title (de)

Einkammer-Aufgussbeutel, insbesondere für Tee, und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Sachet d'infusion à un seul compartiment, en particulier pour thé et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1002743 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110620 A

Priority

EP 98110620 A

Abstract (en)

The two longitudinal edges of the material web in unequal lengths are bent up parallel to each other from the plane of the teabag's surface, interconnected by a knurled seam(8), and then folded back onto the teabag's surface in one or more steps. The folds(17,18) extending along each longitudinal side(15,16) of the teabag are constructed in concertina or bellows form and have at least five and preferably seven fold lines. An Independent claim is included for a procedure for the continuous manufacture, filling and sealing of single-chamber teabags in which the longitudinal edges of the material web are interconnected by a knurled seam and concertina-type folds made in the teabag's longitudinal sides.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Einkammer-Aufgußbeutel zu entwickeln, der unter Beibehaltung der üblichen Außenabmessungen ohne eine Vergrößerung seiner Länge oder Breite im Verpackungszustand ein erheblich vergrößertes Kammervolumen bereitstellt und technisch einfach kontinuierlich unter Materialeinsparung herstellbar sein soll, wird mit der Erfindung vorgeschlagen, daß die beiden Längsseiten der Kammer durch Schlauchformung gebildet sind, bei der die beiden Längsränder einer heißsiegelfähigen Materialbahn nach innen zur Längsmitte hin bis zur Berührung oder Überlappung umgeschlagen und miteinander durch eine Mittel-Längs-Rändelung verbunden sind, wobei an jeder Längsseite eine nach innen in die Kammer hinein sich erstreckende Einfaltung vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/808 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/808 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9104897 U1 19910814

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002743 A1 20000524; EP 1002743 B1 20010829; DE 59801339 D1 20011004

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150610

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040610

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020612

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-06 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020606

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801339

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-04

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2001-01-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURING, FILLING AND CLOSING OF INFUSION BAGS WITH ONE COMPARTMENT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990108

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI