Global Patent Index - EP 1002853 A1

EP 1002853 A1 2000-05-24 - Process for the production of low sulfur gasolines

Title (en)

Process for the production of low sulfur gasolines

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Benzin mit niedrigem Schwefelgehalt

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'essences à faible teneur en soufre

Publication

EP 1002853 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402792 A

Priority

FR 9814480 A

Abstract (en)

The process comprises the separation of a petrol cut containing sulfur into light and heavy fractions, the cut-off point being chosen to maximize the olefin content in the light fraction, hydrodesulfuration of the light fraction using a nickel-based catalyst, hydrodesulfuration of the heavy fraction using a group VIII and/or group VIB metallic catalyst, and blending of the two desulfurized fractions.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de production d'essence à faible teneur en soufre, dans lequel ledit procédé comprend : une séparation d'une essence contenant du soufre en une fraction légère et une fraction lourde, une hydrodésulfuration de l'essence légère sur un catalyseur à base de nickel, une hydrodésulfuration de la fraction lourde sur un catalyseur comprenant au moins un métal du groupe VIII et/ou au moins un métal du groupe Vlb, et le mélange des fractions désulfurées.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 65/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/755 (2006.01); C10G 45/06 (2006.01); C10G 65/16 (2006.01); C10G 75/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002853 A1 20000524; EP 1002853 B1 20060614; CN 1158378 C 20040721; CN 1253993 A 20000524; DE 69931876 D1 20060727; DE 69931876 T2 20061005; ES 2267238 T3 20070301; FR 2785908 A1 20000519; FR 2785908 B1 20051216; JP 2000160169 A 20000613; JP 4547745 B2 20100922; KR 100626623 B1 20060925; KR 20000035520 A 20000626; US 6334948 B1 20020101

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151110

2017-03-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170303

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69931876

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 69931876

- Effective date: 20110331

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2267238 T3

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931876 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT NL

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT NL

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI