Global patent index - EP 1002866 A1

EP 1002866 A1 2000-05-24 - TEMPERATURE SENSITIVE dtsR GENES

Title (en)

TEMPERATURE SENSITIVE dtsR GENES

Title (de)

TEMPERATUR-EMPFINDLICHE dtsR GENE

Title (fr)

GENES DTSR SENSIBLES A LA TEMPERATURE

Publication

EP 1002866 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929834 A

Priority

  • JP 9803017 W
  • JP 18417697 A

Abstract (en)

DNAS encoding the following proteins (A) or (B) which participate in the temperature sensitivity to surfactants of corynebacteria: (A) a protein having the amino acid sequence represented by SEQ ID NO:2 or a protein having the amino acid sequence represented by SEQ ID NO:2 wherein Leu at the 139-position is substituted by another amino acid residue excluding Pro and having a temperature sensitive DTSR activity; and (B) proteins derived from the above proteins (A) by substitution, deletion, insertion, addition or inversion of one or several amino acid residues except the one at the 139-position in the amino acid sequence represented by SEQ ID NO:2 and having the temperature sensitive DTSR activity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/31; C12N 1/21; C12P 13/08; C12P 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/345 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/31 (2006.01); C12P 13/08 (2006.01); C12P 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/345 (2013.01); C12P 13/08 (2013.01); C12P 13/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002866 A1 20000524; EP 1002866 A4 20030108; EP 1002866 B1 20051012; AU 732093 B2 20010412; AU 7937498 A 19990208; BR 9810990 A 20000808; CN 1237174 C 20060118; CN 1265702 A 20000906; DE 69835955 D1 20061102; ID 24444 A 20000720; JP 4495788 B2 20100707; MY 125880 A 20060830; PE 01772000 A1 20000229; PL 337998 A1 20000925; WO 9902692 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080703

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080703

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080703

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69835955

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030909

2003-01-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021126

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12N 15/31 A, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 12P 13/08 B, 7C 12P 13/14 B, 7C 12N 9/00 B

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT