Global patent index - EP 1002882 A1

EP 1002882 A1 2000-05-24 - A beta titanium alloy

Title (en)

A beta titanium alloy

Title (de)

Legierung auf Titan-Basis mit Beta-Stuktur

Title (fr)

Une alliage de titane de phase beta

Publication

EP 1002882 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308274 A

Priority

GB 9824611 A

Abstract (en)

A beta titanium alloy comprises 25wt% vanadium, 15wt% chromium, 2wt% aluminium, up to 0.15wt% oxygen, 0.1 to 0.3wt% carbon and the balance titanium plus incidental impurities. The carbon is present in the form of titanium carbide precipitates distributed throughout the beta titanium alloy matrix, the titanium carbide precipitates refine the grain size of the beta titanium alloy matrix and remove oxygen from the beta titanium alloy matrix to reduce precipitation of alpha titanium in the beta titanium alloy matrix to increase the ductility of the beta titanium alloy. The alloy is useful for gas turbine engine compressor blades (10), compressor vanes, compressor casings etc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 14/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 14/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5759484 A 19980602 - KASHII HIDEAKI [JP], et al
  • [A] US 5176762 A 19930105 - BERCZIK DOUGLAS M [US]
  • [A] LI, Y.G. (UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM (UK)) ET AL: "Order-disorder transformation and deformation structure in beta TiVCrAl alloys.", ELECTRON MICROSCOPY 1998. VOLUME 2. MATERIALS SCIENCE 1 (1998), 59-60, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, 3 REF. INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING. TECHNO HOUSE, REDCLIFFE WAY, BRISTOL, BS1 6NX, UK CONFERENCE: 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON ELECTRON MICROSCOPY, CANCUN,, XP002128835
  • [A] LI, Y.G. (UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM (ENGLAND)) ET AL: "Effect of aluminium on ordering of highly stabilised beta -Ti-V-Cr alloys", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY (AUG. 1998) 14, (8), 732-737, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, DIFFRACTION PATTERNS, 15 REF. ISSN: 0267-0836, XP002128836
  • [A] LI, Y.G. (UNIVERSITY OF BIRMINGHAM (ENGLAND)) ET AL: "Structure and stability of precipitates in 500 deg C exposed Ti-25V-15Cr-xAl alloys.", ACTA MATERIALIA (1998) 46, (16), 5777-5794, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, DIFFRACTION PATTERNS, NUMERICAL DATA, GRAPHS, 11 REF. ISSN: 1359-6454, XP002128837

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002882 A1 20000524; EP 1002882 B1 20021211; DE 69904430 D1 20030123; DE 69904430 T2 20031030; GB 9824611 D0 19990106; US 2002108682 A1 20020815; US 2006021680 A1 20060202; US 2010047076 A1 20100225

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69904430

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-23

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI