Global Patent Index - EP 1002884 A1

EP 1002884 A1 2000-05-24 - COLD ROLLED STEEL PLATE OF EXCELLENT MOLDABILITY, PANEL SHAPE CHARACTERISTICS AND DENTING RESISTANCE, MOLTEN ZINC PLATED STEEL PLATE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THESE STEEL PLATES

Title (en)

COLD ROLLED STEEL PLATE OF EXCELLENT MOLDABILITY, PANEL SHAPE CHARACTERISTICS AND DENTING RESISTANCE, MOLTEN ZINC PLATED STEEL PLATE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THESE STEEL PLATES

Title (de)

KALTGEWALZTE STAHLPLATTE EXZELLENTER FORMBARKEIT, FLACHFÖRMIGEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND EINDELLWIDERSTAND, FEUERVERZINKTE STAHLPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PLAQUE D'ACIER LAMINEE A FROID POSSEDANT D'EXCELLENTES CARACTERISTIQUES D'APTITUDE AU MOULAGE ET DE FORMABILITE EN PANNEAUX, UNE BONNE RESISTANCE A LA CONSTRICTION, PLAQUE D'ACIER A PLACAGE EN ZINC MOULE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CES PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1002884 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98944222 A

Priority

  • JP 9804283 W
  • JP 11678898 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a cold-rolled steel sheet excellent in formability, panel shapeability and dent-resistance, comprising 0.005 to 0.015% by weight of C, 0.01 to 0.2% by weight of Si, 0.2 to 1.5% by weight of Mn, 0.01 to 0.07% by weight of P, 0.006 to 0.015% by weight of S, 0.01 to 0.08% by weight of sol. Al, not higher than 0.004% by weight of N (N </= 0.004%), not higher than 0.003% by weight of O (O </= 0.003%), 0.04 to 0.23% by weight of Nb, 1.0 </= (Nb% x 12)/(C% x 93) </= 3.0, and a balance of Fe and unavoidable impurities, said cold-rolled steel sheet meeting the relationship given below: <MATH> where 0.002 < epsilon </= 0.096, epsilon represents a true strain, sigma 0.2 represents a 0.2% proof stress, and sigma represents a true stress relative to epsilon .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00; C21D 8/02; C21D 8/04; C21D 9/46; C21D 9/48; C22C 38/04; C22C 38/12; C22C 38/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C21D 9/48 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01); C23C 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/12 (2013.01); C21D 8/0426 (2013.01); C21D 8/0436 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C23C 2/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002884 A1 20000524; EP 1002884 A4 20060405; EP 1002884 B1 20090225; BR 9810485 A 20000912; CN 1084797 C 20020515; CN 1138016 C 20040211; CN 1261408 A 20000726; CN 1405352 A 20030326; DE 69840595 D1 20090409; EP 2172575 A1 20100407; JP 4177478 B2 20081105; JP H11310849 A 19991109; KR 100345012 B1 20020720; KR 20010014238 A 20010226; WO 9955927 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69840595 P 20090409

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-04-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060216

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/00 A

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/46 B

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/48 B

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 8/02 B

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 21D 8/04 B

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/04 B

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/12 B

2005-11-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/14 B

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB