Global Patent Index - EP 1002892 B1

EP 1002892 B1 2001-12-19 - Flat textile fabric

Title (en)

Flat textile fabric

Title (de)

Textiles Flächengebilde

Title (fr)

Article textile plat

Publication

EP 1002892 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121875 A

Priority

  • EP 98121875 A
  • US 43829899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002892A1] The structure of a textile material (1), for use as belts or blankets etc. in papermaking machines, has groups of additional and adjacent structure filaments as further bonding structure filaments (25,26) bonded into at least two textile layers, to alternate in at least one layer (2,3) along their length. The bonding structure filaments (23-26) alternate along their length in each group in the textile layers (2,3) they are bonding together. The groups of bonding structure filaments in one direction alternate with non-bonding structure filaments (4-14), where a number of non-bonding structure filaments are aligned next to each other. The woven layer or at least one of the woven layers is composed wholly of bonding structure filaments in one direction. The non-bonding structure filaments (4-14;15-22) are not woven together in their woven layer (2). The bonding structure filaments (23-26) are not woven together in their woven layer. The bonding (23-26) and non-bonding (4-14;15-22;27-37;38-48) filaments form a unified woven pattern on at least one outer side of the fabric (1). All the layers are woven layers (2-3). At least one layer can be a nonwoven, especially as bands of filaments with intersecting structure filaments.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 11/00; D21F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 23/00 (2006.01); D03D 11/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

D03D (2006.01); D21F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/0045 (2013.01); D03D 11/00 (2013.01); Y10T 442/3203 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002892 A1 20000524; EP 1002892 B1 20011219; AT 211191 T 20020115; AU 5933499 A 20000525; AU 726838 B2 20001123; BR 9905647 A 20000926; BR 9905647 B1 20090505; CA 2288843 A1 20000518; CA 2288843 C 20031202; DE 59802555 D1 20020131; ES 2168716 T3 20020616; ID 23823 A 20000517; KR 20010047010 A 20010615; PT 1002892 E 20020628; TW 498116 B 20020811; US 6223780 B1 20010501; ZA 9907160 B 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151229

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 211191 T

- Effective date: 20141118

2015-06-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140519

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THOMAS JOSEF *HEIMBACH G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-05-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140519

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120518

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168716 T3

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802555 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211191 T 20020115

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI