Global Patent Index - EP 1002893 A3

EP 1002893 A3 2000-11-29 - Process for knitting tubular articles in a single-cylinder circular knitting machine, namely for the manufacturing of stockings

Title (en)

Process for knitting tubular articles in a single-cylinder circular knitting machine, namely for the manufacturing of stockings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Stricken von Schlauchwaren an einer Monozylinder-Rundstrickmaschine, insbesondere zur Herstellung von Strümpfen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour tricoter d'articles tubulaires dans un métier à tricoter circulaire à cylindre unique, en particulier pour la fabrication de bas

Publication

EP 1002893 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99830575 A

Priority

IT FI980249 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002893A2] Process for knitting a thread (F) for forming a tubular article in a single-cylinder circular knitting machine, namely for the manufacturing of stockings. The machine comprises a plurality of needles (1) co-operating with a plurality of sinkers (2), slidably inserted between the needles (1). According to the process, for each feed of the thread (F), backward and forward displacements of a respective sinker (2) occur in correspondence to the top stroke-end position of a corresponding needle (1), whereby a new stitch (M1) is formed on the upper edge (2b) of the tip (2a) of the sinker (2) and engages with an old stitch (M2), formed in the previous feed, disengaged from the upper edge (2b) as a consequence of said backward displacement and stretched, as a consequence of said forward displacement, between the tip (2a and the needle (1). When needle (1) returns to said starting position the old stitch (M2) is stretched by the tip (2b) and the new stitch (M1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002893 A2 20000524; EP 1002893 A3 20001129; AU 5956299 A 20000525; IT 1305042 B1 20010410; IT FI980249 A1 20000522; IT FI980249 D0 19981120

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI