Global Patent Index - EP 1002909 A1

EP 1002909 A1 2000-05-24 - Wash-basin unit structure

Title (en)

Wash-basin unit structure

Title (de)

Waschbeckenstützkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Structure support de lavabo

Publication

EP 1002909 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98500252 A

Priority

EP 98500252 A

Abstract (en)

The object of this Patent is a "Wash-basin unit structure" with various assembling options derived from combinations of deep or shallow wash-basins, straight or cut tops and supports on legs or on a unit. Its basic functional elements are the following: the wash-basin proper, shaped as a cap with a spherical surface, which is deep or shallow depending on its depth; and the flat top, four different shapes being provided for its front edge. The supporting legs are cylindrical and tubular, with a horizontal cross member to lean against the wall. The tops are held to the wall by means of rear C-shaped supports with tightening keep screws. If the top is cut, the wash-basin is supported on a central bracket fixed to the wall by means of a tubular cylindrical support. Instead of the leg support, a three-part unit is used having two inversely symmetrical end parts with a convexly curved front, provided with a drawer at the top and a cupboard at the bottom, and joined by the central part, which has a flat front, the top being supported on each of the end parts by means of cylindrical support, which hold it spaced away from and parallel to the upper plane of the unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/32; E03C 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/14 (2006.01); E03C 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/14 (2013.01); E03C 1/32 (2013.01); E03C 2001/321 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002909 A1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI