Global Patent Index - EP 1002916 A1

EP 1002916 A1 2000-05-24 - Additional lock for wings of doors, windows or similar

Title (en)

Additional lock for wings of doors, windows or similar

Title (de)

Zusatzschloss für Flügel von Türen, Fenstern od. dgl

Title (fr)

Serrure supplémentaire pour panneaux de portes, fenêtres ou similaires

Publication

EP 1002916 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103854 A

Priority

  • DE 29601966 U
  • EP 97101615 A

Abstract (en)

The additional lock has at least a push bolt (10) for sliding into a lock plate (12). The bolt has on the lock plate side a hook (14) which after being pushed forward to bridge the rebate area is movable by an expanding device (15) behind the lock plate secure against extension. The drive rod (11) engages on a curved plate (16). The curved plate is guided in a lock housing (17) parallel to the drive rod and has at least one inclined slit (18) in which a guide pin (19) engages to bias the push bolt (10). The guide pin can be fixed directly on the push bolt or on a push bolt support (20).

Abstract (de)

Um ein Zusatzschloß so zu verbessern, daß sein Schubriegel (10) ein gewaltsames Öffnen des Flügels insbesondere durch Verschieben des Flügelrahmens in der Flügelebene verhindert, wird es so ausgebildet, daß es mindestens einen Schubriegel (10) hat, der falzraumüberbrückend in ein Schließblech (12), insbesondere eines Blendrahmens (13) einschiebbar ist, und der schließblechseitig einen Haken (14) hat, der nach falzraumüberbrückendem Riegelvorschub mit einer Spreizeinrichtung (15') auszugfest hinter das Schließblech (12) beweglich ist, wozu der Schubriegel (10) einen in Riegelvorschubrichtung relativbeweglichen Schieber (26) hat, der den Haken (14) bei relativ zum Schubriegel (10) erfolgenden Bewegungen des Schiebers (26) querbeweglich zu beaufschlagen vermag, wobei der Schubriegel (10) mit Hilfe eines Treibstangenbeschlages in das Schließblech (12) einschiebbar ist, der mit einer Treibstange (11) an einem in einem Schloßgehäuse (17) treibstangenparallel geführten Kurvenblech (16) angreift, das einen Schrägschlitz (18) hat, in den ein den Schubriegel (10) beaufschlagender Führungsstift (19) eingreift, wobei der Schieber (26) mit einem Querstift (27) in einen dem Schrägschlitz (18) parallelen Schrägschlitz (28) eingreift, dessen den Querstift (27) bei in das Schließblech (12) vorgeschobenen Schubriegel (10) aufnehmender Endabschnitt (28') die Relativbewegung des Schiebers (26) zum Schubriegel (10) bestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 63/12; E05C 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/12 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/126 (2013.01); E05B 63/127 (2013.01); E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05C 9/1841 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29601966 U1 19970619; EP 0789121 A1 19970813; EP 1002916 A1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010825

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NIEMANN, HANS DIETER

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KRAEMER, STEPHAN

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BUDICH. ANDREAS

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-05-24 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 789121

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL