Global Patent Index - EP 1002921 A2

EP 1002921 A2 2000-05-24 - Slidable folding door

Title (en)

Slidable folding door

Title (de)

Schiebefalttor

Title (fr)

Porte repliable coulissante

Publication

EP 1002921 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890340 A

Priority

AT 76898 U

Abstract (en)

The sliding folding door comprises two folding panels (3,4). The panels in the area of their free side edges are provided with running rollers guided in upper and lower guide rails (11) where the panels are pivotably located. The panels at facing edges are foldably articulately (5) connected. The guides at the fold-in side are extended over the edge of the door opening (1) and the closed door. For the panel (4) located in the closed position in this area of the door an additional forced guide (14-16) is provided which guides the panel and the second panel (3) connected with it into the folded position when the door is opened.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Schiebefalttor mit zwei Faltflügeln (3, 4), die im Bereich ihrer freien Seitenränder mit Laufrollen (8, 10, 12) an oberen und unteren Führungen, insbesondere Führungsschienen (9, 11), geführt und dort schwenkbar gelagert sowie an den zueinander weisenden Rändern untereinander nach der einen Torseite faltbar gelenkig (5) verbunden sind, werden die Führungen (9, 11) an der Einfaltseite über den Rand der Toröffnung (1) und des geschlossenen Tores (3, 4) hinaus verlängert. Um trotz einer einfachen Schiebebetätigung zu gewährleisten, daß die Faltflügel (3, 4) ohne totpunktähnliche Stellungen in die Öffnungsfaltstellung und aus dieser zurück in die Schließstellung geführt werden, ist für den in der Schließstellung in diesem Randbereich des Tores gelagerten Flügel (4) eine zusätzliche Zwangsführung (14, 15, 16) vorgesehen, die ihn und damit den mit ihm verbundenen zweiten Flügel (3) beim Öffnen des Tores in die Faltstellung leiten, in der die Flügel (3, 4) zugleich entlang der verlängerten Führungen (9, 11) über den Rand der Toröffnung ausgeschoben sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/26 (2006.01); E05D 15/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/264 (2013.01); E05D 15/58 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/638 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002921 A2 20000524; EP 1002921 A3 20020717; AT 3075 U1 19990927

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDPOINTNER TORSYSTEME GMBH

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI