Global Patent Index - EP 1002924 A2

EP 1002924 A2 2000-05-24 - Heat-insulating compound profile particularly for windows, doors, facades or the like

Title (en)

Heat-insulating compound profile particularly for windows, doors, facades or the like

Title (de)

Wärmegedämmtes Verbundprofil, insbesondere für Fenster, Türen, Fassaden und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Profilé composite calorifuge, en particulier pour fenêtres, portes, façades ou similaires

Publication

EP 1002924 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122926 A

Priority

DE 19853235 A

Abstract (en)

A heat insulated laminar profile, especially for doors, facades, etc, comprises at least two metal profiles (1,2) which are connected by an insulating slat (3) with longitudinal edge connection members (4) that contact them. The slats are spaced apart, and the middle region (5) of each slat has greater elasticity than the connection members.

Abstract (de)

Das wärmegedämmte Verbundprofil ist insbesondere für Fenster, Türen, Fassaden und dergleichen vorgesehen und besteht aus wenigstens zwei vorzugweise aus Metall bestehenden Profilen (1,2). Die Profile (1,2) sind über mindestens einen zwischen den Profilen (1,2) angeordneten und mit seinen als Anschlußleiste (4) ausgebildeten Längsrändern an den Profilen (1,2) angeschlossenen Isoliersteg (3) miteinander verbunden und im Abstand voneinander gehalten. Der zwischen den Anschlußleisten (4) sich erstreckende Mittelbereich (5) des Isolierstegs (3) weist eine insbesondere in Längsrichtung des Isolierstegs (3) wirksame, gegenüber den Anschlußleisten (4) erhöhte Elastizität auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/26303 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26352 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26361 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26372 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26374 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002924 A2 20000524; EP 1002924 A3 20000920; DE 19853235 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040602

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010310

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI