Global Patent Index - EP 1002924 A3

EP 1002924 A3 2000-09-20 - Heat-insulating compound profile particularly for windows, doors, facades or the like

Title (en)

Heat-insulating compound profile particularly for windows, doors, facades or the like

Title (de)

Wärmegedämmtes Verbundprofil, insbesondere für Fenster, Türen, Fassaden und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Profilé composite calorifuge, en particulier pour fenêtres, portes, façades ou similaires

Publication

EP 1002924 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122926 A

Priority

DE 19853235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002924A2] A heat insulated laminar profile, especially for doors, facades, etc, comprises at least two metal profiles (1,2) which are connected by an insulating slat (3) with longitudinal edge connection members (4) that contact them. The slats are spaced apart, and the middle region (5) of each slat has greater elasticity than the connection members.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/26303 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26352 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26361 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26372 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26374 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002924 A2 20000524; EP 1002924 A3 20000920; DE 19853235 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010310

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI