Global Patent Index - EP 1002933 A2

EP 1002933 A2 2000-05-24 - Downhole hydraulic pressure generator

Title (en)

Downhole hydraulic pressure generator

Title (de)

Hydraulicher Bohrlochdruckgenerator

Title (fr)

Générateur de pression hydraulique de fond de puits

Publication

EP 1002933 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307942 A

Priority

US 18479398 A

Abstract (en)

A hydraulic pressure generator (14) provides pressurized fluid for actuation of well tools. The hydraulic pressure generator (14) comprises: a housing assembly (22); first and second fluid chambers (44,50) in the housing assembly (22); a piston (54) separating the first and second chambers (44,50); and a barrier device (42) isolating the first chamber (44) from fluid pressure in the well external to the housing assembly (22). The barrier device (42) is selectively actuatable to permit fluid communication between the first chamber (44) and the well external to the housing assembly (22), and thereby apply fluid pressure in the second chamber (50) greater than fluid pressure in the first chamber (44) by a predetermined amount. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 23/06 (2006.01); E21B 33/128 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/1285 (2013.01); E21B 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002933 A2 20000524; EP 1002933 A3 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-11-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI