Global Patent Index - EP 1002942 A2

EP 1002942 A2 2000-05-24 - Method for evaluating the opening angle of an air throttle

Title (en)

Method for evaluating the opening angle of an air throttle

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Drosselklappenwinkels

Title (fr)

Méthode pour déterminer l'angle d'ouverture d'un papillon

Publication

EP 1002942 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119248 A

Priority

DE 19853410 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves several circuits (KF1-3) determining the choke flap position from the air mass flow and the difference pressure across the choke flap using a choke flap model. The model is defined by a sub-critical air flow through the choke flap and contains at least two characteristic fields. The first characteristic field describes at least two relationships between the choke flap angle and air mass at different pressure differences and the second the non-linear transition between the characteristic lines in the first field.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Drosselklappenwinkels bei dem mittels eines Drosselklappenmodells aus einem Luftmassenstrom und einem Differenzdruck über der Drosselklappe die Drosselklappenstellung bestimmt wird. Zur Verringerung des Applikationsaufwandes und zum Ermöglichen der Drosselklappenwinkelbestimmung auch bei kleinen Differenzdrücken über der Drosselklappe wird vorgeschlagen, das Drosselklappenmodell aus einem unterkritischen Luftmassenstrom durch die Drosselklappe zu bestimmen, wobei das Drosselklappenmodell zumindest zwei Kennfelder enthält, von denen das erste zumindest zwei Kennfeldlinien enthält, welche den Zusammenhang des Drosselklappenwinkels zur Luftmasse bei unterschiedlichen Differenzdrücken beschreiben, und das zweite Kennfeld den nichtlinearen Übergang zwischen den im ersten Kennfeld vorliegenden Kennfeldlinien angibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/10; F02D 41/00; F02D 41/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/105 (2013.01); F02D 41/2422 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0402 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0406 (2013.01); F02D 2250/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002942 A2 20000524; EP 1002942 A3 20011004; EP 1002942 B1 20040602; DE 19853410 A1 20000525; ES 2218926 T3 20041116; JP 2000161120 A 20000613; US 6318163 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160928

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160928

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160928

2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160929

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218926 T3

2004-09-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909641 P 20040708

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI