Global patent index - EP 1002950 A3

EP 1002950 A3 2000-12-06 - Single-cylinder pump particularly for pumping mortar and similar materials

Title (en)

Single-cylinder pump particularly for pumping mortar and similar materials

Title (de)

Monozylinderpumpe für Beton und ähnliche Materialien

Title (fr)

Pompe monocylindre pour béton et matériaux équivalents

Publication

EP 1002950 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99122043 A

Priority

IT TV980152 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1002950A2] A single-cylinder pump (1), particularly for pumping mortar and similar materials from a hopper or tank. The pump comprises a lower intake chamber (3) provided with a first gravity valve (8), the intake chamber (3) is connected to the delivery of a piston (12) with dual compensating action and to a second gravity valve (9) for feeding the mortar to an upper delivery chamber (6). The dual-action piston (12) is also provided with a transit chamber (17) which is connected to an outlet (18) for the pressurized material and to a duct (19) for connection to the upper delivery chamber (16). A single-cylinder pump is thus obtained which allows to have a sufficiently constant output flow of material at high pressure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002950 A2 20000524; EP 1002950 A3 20001206; IT 1303379 B1 20001106; IT TV980152 A1 20000519

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050203

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20010529;SI PAYMENT 20010529

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI