Global Patent Index - EP 1002958 A2

EP 1002958 A2 2000-05-24 - Radial fan

Title (en)

Radial fan

Title (de)

Radialgebläse

Title (fr)

Ventilateur radial

Publication

EP 1002958 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122979 A

Priority

DE 29820766 U

Abstract (en)

The fan has an impeller (10) which has a blade ring on its periphery. A partition (26) which is arranged on one of the side walls, engages with the impeller and divides its interior chamber into two chambers. The fan has a seal for sealing the gap between the rims of partition and the impeller. A fibre or foam strip (27), especially felt-type strip is provided to seal the gap between the base (12) of the impeller and the edge of the partition which faces the base.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Radialgebläse mit einem topfartigen Laufrad (10) vorgeschlagen, das an seinem Umfang mit einem Schaufelkranz (15) versehen ist. Ein das Laufrad (10) aufnehmendes Gehäuse (11, 11') erweitert sich ausgehend von einem teilkreisartig gekrümmten, direkt entlang des Schaufelkranzes (15) verlaufenden Umfangswandbereich (19) schneckenartig in Drehrichtung des Laufrads (10) radial zu einem Auslaß (21) und besitzt zwei die axialen Stirnseiten des Laufrads (10) abdeckende Seitenwandungen (23, 24). Eine an einer der Seitenwandungen (24) angeordnete Trennwand (26) greift in das topfartige Laufrad (10) ein und unterteilt dessen Innenraum in einen ersten und einen zweiten Saugraum. Dem ersten Saugraum ist eine Ansaugöffnung (28) zugeordnet, und der zweite Saugraum ist dem direkt entlang des Schaufelkranzes (15) verlaufenden Umfangswandbereich (19) zugewandt. Dabei sind Mittel zur Strömungsabdichtung der Spalte zwischen den Rändern der Trennwand (26) und dem Laufrad (10) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/08; F04D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/04 (2006.01); F04D 25/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/04 (2013.01); F04D 25/166 (2013.01); F04D 29/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820766 U1 19990114; EP 1002958 A2 20000524; EP 1002958 A3 20040929

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-06-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/08 A

2004-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 17/04 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI