Global patent index - EP 1002959 A2

EP 1002959 A2 2000-05-24 - Centrifugal pump assembly

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump assembly

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpenaggregat

Title (fr)

Ensemble de pompe centrifuge

Publication

EP 1002959 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122438 A

Priority

DE 19853400 A

Abstract (en)

The centrifugal pump unit consists essentially of an electric motor and a centrifugal pump driven by the motor with a centrifugal wheel and an enclosing housing. A motor unit (2) also contains the centrifugal wheel and at least one wall part (5) for the pump housing (8). The remaining structure of the pump housing is removably joined to the motor unit by at least one clamping and holding element (15).

Abstract (de)

Das Kreiselpumpenaggregat umfaßt eine elektrische Motorbaueinheit (2) und eine davon angetriebene Kreiselpumpe (3) mit einem Kreiselrad (7) und einem dieses umgebenden Gehäuse (8). Die Motorbaueinheit trägt das Kreiselrad der Pumpe und weist mindestens ein Wandteil (5) für das Pumpengehäuse auf. Der übrige Aufbau des Pumpengehäuses (8) ist über mindestens ein klemmendes Spann- und Halteelement (15) lösbar mit dem Wandteil der Motorbaueinheit (2) für das Pumpengehäuse verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/62; F04D 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01); F04D 29/628 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002959 A2 20000524; EP 1002959 A3 20000830; EP 1002959 B1 20050608; DE 19853400 C1 20000720

INPADOC legal status

2016-09-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912145

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040213

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI