Global Patent Index - EP 1002986 A2

EP 1002986 A2 2000-05-24 - Apparatus for withdrawal of a pressurized liquid gas from a pressurized container

Title (en)

Apparatus for withdrawal of a pressurized liquid gas from a pressurized container

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entnahme eines unter Druck stehenden flüssigen Gasstromes aus einem Druckbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de prélèvement d'un gaz liquide sous pression d'un réservoir sous pression

Publication

EP 1002986 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122188 A

Priority

DE 19853531 A

Abstract (en)

The system's pressure producer(2) has a condensation volume(4) which is partially in heat conducting contact with the low temperature liquefied gas(5) and partially in heat conducting contact with a heat reservoir at a higher temperature in relation to the cold liquid. The condensation volume is at least in flow communication with the discharge line(3). The pressure producer has an oscillating volume(8) which is connected to the discharge line exclusively through the condensation volume and which is not in heat conducting contact with the low temperature liquid gas. The condensation volume is constructed as a U-bend with its lower portion passing through the liquefied gas.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Entnahme eines Gasstromes aus einem isolierten Druckbehälter (1) für tiefkalt verflüssigtes Gas, mit einer Druckerzeugungsvorrichtung (2) und einer mit dem isolierten Druckbehälter (1) in Verbindung stehenden Entnahmeleitung (3), wobei mit Hilfe der Druckerzeugungsvorrichtung (2) flüssiges Gas verdampft wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird eine besonders einfache Druckerzeugungsvorrichtung dadurch zur Verfügung gestellt, daß die Druckerzeugungsvorrichtung (2) ein Kondensationsvolumen (4) aufweist, daß das Kondensationsvolumen (4) teilweise mit dem tiefkalten flüssigen Gas (5) in wärmeleitendem Kontakt steht, daß das Kondensationsvolumen (4) teilweise mit einem auf gegenüber dem tiefkalten flüssigen Gas (5) höherer Temperatur befindlichen Wärmereservoir in wärmeleitendem Kontakt steht, daß das Kondensationsvolumen (4) mit der Entnahmeleitung (3) zumindest strömungsverbindbar ist und daß die Druckerzeugungsvorrichtung (2) ein ausschließlich über das Kondensationsvolumen (4) mit der Entnahmeleitung (3) verbundenes, im wesentlichen mit dem tiefkalten Flüssiggas nicht in wärmeleitendem Kontakt stehendes Schwingungsvolumen (8) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 7/02; F17C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 9/00 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2203/03 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0323 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0352 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0161 (2013.01); F17C 2223/047 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0316 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1002986 A2 20000524; EP 1002986 A3 20001004; CN 1254809 A 20000531; DE 19853531 A1 20000525; DE 19853531 C2 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061208

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GROUP GMBH

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 17C 7/02 A, 7F 17C 9/00 B, 7F 17C 7/04 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI