Global Patent Index - EP 1003005 A1

EP 1003005 A1 2000-05-24 - Integrated heat exchanger, more particularly for automotive vehicle

Title (en)

Integrated heat exchanger, more particularly for automotive vehicle

Title (de)

Integrierter Wärmetauscher, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur combiné, en particulier pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1003005 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99122374 A

Priority

FR 9814655 A

Abstract (en)

The combined motor vehicle oil and coolant heat exchanger comprises a tube bundle (10) connected to a manifold box (16,18). It is divided into a part (A) forming a gearbox oil cooler having tubes (12a) through which oil (H) passes and a part (B) forming a condenser with tubes (12b) through which a refrigerant flows. The same air flow cools both oil and refrigerant. The two sets of tubes have different hydraulic diameters (Dha,DHb) connected by the following inequality: 0.8 mm<2> Dha x DHb 3.00 mm<2>. The hydraulic diameter of the oil cooler tubes is greater than the hydraulic diameter of the condenser tubes.

Abstract (fr)

Un échangeur de chaleur combiné, en particulier pour véhicule automobile, comprend un faisceau (10) relié à deux boîtes collectrices (16, 18) et divisé en une partie (A) formant refroidisseur d'huile ayant des tubes (12a) propres à être parcourus par de l'huile (H) et une partie (B) formant condenseur et ayant des tubes (12b) propres à être parcourus par un fluide réfrigérant. Les tubes (12a) et les tubes (12b) sont différents et possèdent des diamètres hydrauliques respectifs (DHa) et (Dhb) liés par l'inégalité suivante : 0,8 mm<2> <= DHa x DHb <= 3,00 mm<2> où le diamètre hydraulique (DH) d'un tube est défini par la formule DH = 4S/P, dans laquelle S désigne l'aire de la section interne du tube exprimée en mm<2> et P le périmètre interne, ou "périmètre mouillé", exprimé en mm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/04 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F28D 1/0443 (2013.01); F28F 1/022 (2013.01); F28F 13/00 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0084 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0089 (2013.01); F28F 2270/02 (2013.01); Y10S 165/916 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003005 A1 20000524; EP 1003005 B1 20040310; AT 261573 T 20040315; BR 9905655 A 20000912; DE 69915431 D1 20040415; DE 69915431 T2 20040819; ES 2217672 T3 20041101; FR 2786259 A1 20000526; FR 2786259 B1 20010202; US 6394176 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040810

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-12-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-11-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040415

2006-11-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041210

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-04-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040415

2005-04-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041210

2005-02-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040415

2005-02-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217672 T3

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

2004-06-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040610

2004-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915431 P 20040415

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI