Global Patent Index - EP 1003077 A2

EP 1003077 A2 2000-05-24 - Process for making photographic process chemicals in tablet form

Title (en)

Process for making photographic process chemicals in tablet form

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von als Tablette formulierten fotografischen Prozesschemikalien

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de produits chimiques photographiques sous forme de comprimé

Publication

EP 1003077 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119025 A

Priority

DE 19853273 A

Abstract (en)

Production of photographic processing chemicals in shaped form comprises (a) comminuting at least 50 wt.% of the inorganic part of the ingredients to a particle size of 125 mu m or below; and (b) direct pressing the ingredients to give a shape of hardness at least 400N.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von als Formkörper formulierten fotografischen Prozeßchemikalie, mit den Schritten: a) Zerkleinern von wenigstens 50 Gew.-% des anorganischen Anteils der Einsatzmaterialien auf eine mittlere Korngröße von 125µm oder weniger, b) Direktverpressen der Einsatzmaterialien zu einem Formkörper mit einer Härte von wenigstens 400 N. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner nach diesem Verfahren erhältliche Formkörper. Das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren ermöglicht ohne aufwendige Vorbehandlungen wie bspw. Wirbelschichtgranulierung des entsprechenden Anteils der Einsatzmaterialien die Herstellung harter und abriebfester Tabletten zum Einsatz in Entwicklerautomaten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/265 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003077 A2 20000524; EP 1003077 A3 20000920; EP 1003077 B1 20040107; DE 19853273 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130929

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908242

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130929

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121008

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TETENAL PHOTOWERK G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040415

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908242 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021204

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI