Global patent index - EP 1003083 A1

EP 1003083 A1 2000-05-24 - A device for large format printing comprising a single central conditioning unit for controlling and monitoring the condition of the developer

Title (en)

A device for large format printing comprising a single central conditioning unit for controlling and monitoring the condition of the developer

Title (de)

Grossformatdrucker mit einer zentralen Konditioniereinheit zur Kontrolle und Überwachung des Entwicklerzustandes

Title (fr)

Appareil d'impression pour imprimer à grand format avec une unité central de conditionnement pour commander et surveiller de la condition d'un révélateur

Publication

EP 1003083 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203873 A

Priority

EP 98203873 A

Abstract (en)

A large format single pass printer, having a printing width (PW) for printing a toner image on a substrate, the substrate having a width (WS) and a length (LS), comprising a printhead structure with an array of printing apertures, with length, LA, and control electrodes associated therewith, a charged toner conveyer, CTC, with a length, LCTC LA and a number n, equal to or larger than 2, of toner applicators with width PWEi < LCTC for applying charged toner particles to said CTC, said number n being chosen such that <MATH> wherein i) a single central conditioning unit for controlling and monitoring the condition of the developer is provided, and ii)the central conditioning unit is equipped with means for circulating the developer to all of the toner applicators and back to the central unit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08; G03G 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/385 (2006.01); G03G 15/05 (2006.01); G03G 15/08 (2006.01); G03G 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2013.01); G03G 15/346 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003083 A1 20000524; EP 1003083 B1 20010411; DE 69800703 D1 20010517; DE 69800703 T2 20011025; JP 2000141737 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011107

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-09-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800703

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-04-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-02-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A DEVICE FOR LARGE FORMAT PRINTING COMPRISING A SINGLE CENTRAL CONDITIONING UNIT FOR CONTROLLING AND MONITORING THE CONDITION OF THE DEVELOPER

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI