Global Patent Index - EP 1003084 A2

EP 1003084 A2 2000-05-24 - Cleaning web

Title (en)

Cleaning web

Title (de)

Reinigungsband

Title (fr)

Bande de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1003084 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309198 A

Priority

GB 9825343 A

Abstract (en)

A cleaning web 40 for use in electrostatic reproduction equipment including fibres the cross-section of each of which having a peripheral dimension and an area, wherein the ratio of the peripheral dimension and cross-sectional area is greater than the said ratio for a fibre of circular or substantially circular and equal area of cross-section, for instance tri-lobal or multi-lobal fibres. One side of the cleaning web may be substantially impermeable. A cleaning web having one substantially impermeable side may be produced with conventional fibres. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/2025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003084 A2 20000524; EP 1003084 A3 20011128; GB 9825343 D0 19990113

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI