Global Patent Index - EP 1003132 A2

EP 1003132 A2 2000-05-24 - Optoelectronic-electromagnetic device with recording of electrical signals for vehicles

Title (en)

Optoelectronic-electromagnetic device with recording of electrical signals for vehicles

Title (de)

Optoelektronisch- elektromagnetische Anlage mit Aufzeichnung von elektrischen Signalen an Fahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Dispositif optoélectronique-électromagnétique à enregistrement de signaux électriques pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1003132 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99203569 A

Priority

IT BZ980067 A

Abstract (en)

Four cameras/minicams (5,7,9,11) are located inside vehicle, one directed to front, one to the rear and one to each side. Two microphones (13,15) are provided, one inside vehicle and one on roof. Each device is connected to track of image and sound recorder (3). Cameras and microphones are activated by sensors detecting distance and movement.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine optoelektronisch- elektromagnetische Anlage mit Aufzeichnung von elektrischen Signalen an Fahrzeugen. Gemäß der Erfindung umfasst die Anlage mindestens eine Kamera (5, 7, 9, 11) und mindestens ein Mikrofon (13, 15), die jeweils mit einer Speicherspur eines Bild-Tonaufzeichnungsgerät (3) verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/0891 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003132 A2 20000524; EP 1003132 A3 20000809; IT 1303535 B1 20001106; IT BZ980067 A1 20000512

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI