Global Patent Index - EP 1003175 A1

EP 1003175 A1 2000-05-24 - Recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (en)

Recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (de)

Aufnahme- und Wiedergabeapparat

Title (fr)

Appareil d'enregistrement et de lecture

Publication

EP 1003175 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99122212 A

Priority

JP 32635198 A

Abstract (en)

A recording and reproducing apparatus (K) comprising: a nonvolatile memory (7) which acts as a recording medium; and a control unit (5) for executing recording and reproduction on the nonvolatile memory (7); wherein the nonvolatile memory (7) includes a first area (71) for recording management information (FMT1) of whole of the nonvolatile memory (7) and a second area (72) for recording data of respective files; wherein the first area (71) has a first file management table (FMT1) produced at the time of start of recording of the files and including at least a first management area (7a) for managing information on addresses of start sectors of the files and a second management area (7b, 7c) for managing information on usable space areas of the files; wherein the second area (72) has a second file management table (FMT2) produced at a leading portion of each of sectors of each of the files on a real-time basis during recording of the files and formed by link information (7d, 7e) on corresponding ones of the sectors; wherein when the control unit (5) executes recording and reproduction on the nonvolatile memory (7), the control unit (5) performs file management on the basis of information from the first and second file management tables (FMT1, FMT2); wherein at the time of start of use of the nonvolatile memory (7), the control unit (5) secures a space area from a leading portion of the second area (72) so as to use the second area (72) as a data area sequentially from the leading portion of the second area (72). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11C 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G10L 19/00 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11C 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 7/16 (2013.01); G11C 2207/16 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99953 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99956 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003175 A1 20000524; EP 1003175 B1 20041027; CN 1150556 C 20040519; CN 1256494 A 20000614; DE 69921426 D1 20041202; DE 69921426 T2 20051027; JP 2000148569 A 20000530; JP 3511916 B2 20040329; KR 100338987 B1 20020531; KR 20000035532 A 20000626; TW 477980 B 20020301; US 6269434 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141106

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141106

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69921426

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-03-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140220 AND 20140226

2014-03-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: GODO KAISHA IP BRIDGE 1, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GODO KAISHA IP BRIDGE 1, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GODO KAISHA IP BRIDGE 1, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69921426

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-03-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GODO KAISHA IP BRIDGE 1, JP

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69921426

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69921426

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131106

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-17 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20100127

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69921426

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030523

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI