Global Patent Index - EP 1003187 A2

EP 1003187 A2 2000-05-24 - Switch template for control switches, in particular for operating electric devices in motor vehicles

Title (en)

Switch template for control switches, in particular for operating electric devices in motor vehicles

Title (de)

Schaltervorrichtung für Steuerschalter, insbesondere für elektrische Steuervorrichtung in Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Gabarit de contacteur pour commutateur à commande, en particulier pour des dispositifs électriques de fonctionnement dans des véhicules à moteur

Publication

EP 1003187 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117356 A

Priority

IT MI980741 U

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a switch template for control switches, in particular for operating electric devices in motor vehicles, the template comprising a plurality of push-buttons which are operatively coupled to an actuator holding bodies holding therein a plurality of actuators controlled by said push-buttons. The main feature of the invention is that the push-buttons and holding body comprise a single piece made by molding. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003187 A2 20000524; EP 1003187 A3 20020925; IT 244376 Y1 20020311; IT MI980741 U1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041119

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 13/06 A, 7H 01H 13/70 B

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI