Global Patent Index - EP 1003194 A1

EP 1003194 A1 2000-05-24 - Luminous indicator for blown fuses and their causes in electrical circuits of automobiles

Title (en)

Luminous indicator for blown fuses and their causes in electrical circuits of automobiles

Title (de)

Lichtemittierende Anzeigevorrichtung von durchgebrannten Sicherungen und ihren Ursachen in elekrischen Schaltungen von Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Indicateur lumineux de fusibles fondus et leurs causes dans les circuits électriques pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1003194 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98500257 A

Priority

ES 9802923 U

Abstract (en)

Made up of a holder element (1) on which one or several detecting circuits (4) are assembled constituted by a lamp of LED diode connected in series to a Zener diode and a resistance, dimensioned in such a way that the LED turns on when the value of the impedance of the circuit to be protected is lower than a predetermined value. The detecting circuit (4) has two connecting tags (8) foreseen to hold the fuse element (2) itself, which being made up of a soft metal strip in the shape of an "H" is clamped by the holder (1) by means of a clamping mechanism made up of two stops (12) which are inserted into two slits (9) which the fuse element has and which can be released by pressing on the corresponding levers (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/32 (2006.01); H01H 85/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/32 (2013.01); H01H 85/0208 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003194 A1 20000524; EP 1003194 B1 20040804; DE 69825453 D1 20040909; DE 69825453 T2 20050818; ES 1041586 U 19990701; ES 1041586 Y 19991216; PT 1003194 E 20041231

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-06-04 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825453 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI