Global Patent Index - EP 1003235 A1

EP 1003235 A1 2000-05-24 - Linear/circular polarization converter utilizing elliptical waveguide

Title (en)

Linear/circular polarization converter utilizing elliptical waveguide

Title (de)

Linear/Zirkular- Polarisationswandler mit elliptischem Hohlleiter

Title (fr)

Convertisseur de polarisation linéaire/circulaire utilisant un guide d' onde elliptique

Publication

EP 1003235 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308849 A

Priority

JP 33126598 A

Abstract (en)

The linear/circular polarizing converter of the present invention uses an elliptical waveguide (1) having elliptical cross-section which receives supply of a linearly polarized signal at one end of elliptical waveguide and outputs a circularly polarized signal from the other end of elliptical waveguide (1) When the application frequency wavelength of polarized signal supplied to the elliptical waveguide is lambda 0, length of elliptical waveguide is L, cutoff wavelength of polarizing plane in the long axis direction of polarized signal is lambda CH, cutoff wavelength of the polarizing plane in the short axis direction of polarized signal is lambda CV, phase of the basic mode polarization signal in the long axis direction for the polarized signal is H, phase of basic mode polarization in the short axis direction is V and phase difference of these phases H and V is DELTA , H is expressed using lambda 0, lambda CH and L, while V is expressed using lambda 0, lambda CV and L, and long axis size a, short axis size b and length L in the tube axis direction are selected to meet DELTA = 90 DEG . <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/17 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 2607849 A 19520819 - PURCELL EDWARD M, et al
  • [X] LADANYI-TUROCZY B: "DESIGN OF A SUPERELLIPTIC WAVEGUIDE POLARIZER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE,GB,TUNBRIDGE WELLS, MICROWAVE EXHIBITIONS, vol. CONF. 16, 1986, pages 441 - 446, XP002023207
  • [A] J. DESCHAMPS ET AL.: "ÉTUDE ET RÉALISATION D' UN POLARISEUR CIRCULAIRE D' ONDES HYPERFRÉQUENCE A FORTE TENUE EN PUISSANCE", REVUE DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE., vol. 5, no. 2, April 1970 (1970-04-01), LES EDITIONS DE PHYSIQUE. PARIS., FR, pages 283 - 286, XP002131486
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 333 (E - 794) 26 July 1989 (1989-07-26)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003235 A1 20000524; CN 1254963 A 20000531; JP 2000165102 A 20000616; KR 100322178 B1 20020206; KR 20000047673 A 20000725; TW 439316 B 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001125

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI