Global Patent Index - EP 1003236 A2

EP 1003236 A2 2000-05-24 - Device and method for producing radio frequency components

Title (en)

Device and method for producing radio frequency components

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hochfrequenzbauteilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la production de composants haute fréquence

Publication

EP 1003236 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120309 A

Priority

DE 19853022 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves making the components from several parts using joints that are designed so that when assembling the individual parts at the joints, a loss-free electrical contact is guaranteed. A pressure edge is used so that the parts can be joined together with low insertion force. An Independent claim is also included for high frequency components

Abstract (de)

Hochfrequenzbautelle werden durch Schrauben oder Löten gefügt. Dies ist zelt- und kostenintensiv. Diese Problematik wird durch mechanisches Fügen unter Vorspannung, insbesondere Presspannung, minimiert, wobei der elektrische Kontakt an den Fügebereichen gewährleistet wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 11/002 (2013.01); H01P 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003236 A2 20000524; EP 1003236 A3 20020206; DE 19853022 A1 20000525

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20071031

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI