EP 1003237 A1 20000524 - Antenna used in a transceiver
Title (en)
Antenna used in a transceiver
Title (de)
Antenne für ein Funkkommunikationsgerät
Title (fr)
Antenne destinée à un émetteur récepteur de radiocommunication
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 9814412 A 19981117
Abstract (en)
The luminous antenna unit has a diode light source (9) and light conductor tube (3) which form a spoke like section and has an upper light transparent cap. The base of the antenna has ring connectors (5a,5b). The diodes are fed by the mobile telephone receiver using the ring connectors to provide a light source output.
Abstract (fr)
L'antenne a l'apparence d'une tige et comprend une source de lumière et un conduit de lumière muni d'une partie diffusant la lumière ; la source de lumière est une diode électroluminescente encapsulée dans un boîtier et munie de connexions, ce boîtier est fixé à l'antenne en face du conduit de lumière, et les connexions de la diode sont disposées de façon à permettre, lorsque l'antenne est mise en place dans le récepteur, un contact électrique avec des conducteurs électriques du récepteur. Applications : notamment téléphones mobiles <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01Q 1/06 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/44 (2006.01); H04M 1/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
H01Q 1/06 (2013.01 - EP KR US); H01Q 1/24 (2013.01 - KR); H01Q 1/241 (2013.01 - EP US); H01Q 1/44 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [DXA] EP 0865098 A1 19980916 - KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]
- [A] DE 29720031 U1 19980115 - WOLFRUM WERNER [DE]
- [PX] US 5917453 A 19990629 - UCHINO SHIGERU [JP], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 003 27 February 1998 (1998-02-27)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 001 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 305 (E - 363) 3 December 1985 (1985-12-03)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1003237 A1 20000524; CN 1149707 C 20040512; CN 1256524 A 20000614; JP 2000196319 A 20000714; KR 100695808 B1 20070315; KR 20000035538 A 20000626; TW 439320 B 20010607; US 6262686 B1 20010717
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99203699 A 19991108; CN 99124326 A 19991112; JP 32444399 A 19991115; KR 19990051185 A 19991117; TW 88121886 A 19991214; US 43920099 A 19991112