Global Patent Index - EP 1003238 A1

EP 1003238 A1 2000-05-24 - Mobile mast and telecommunications apparatus

Title (en)

Mobile mast and telecommunications apparatus

Title (de)

Mobiler Mast und Telekommunikationsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Mât mobile et appareil de télécommunication

Publication

EP 1003238 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308980 A

Priority

GB 9824589 A

Abstract (en)

A mobile mast (2) supported on a base (1) and capable of being raised from a stowed position lying substantially horizontal relative to the base (1) to an erected position. At least two outriggers (3,4) are attached to the base (1) at spaced positions which have guy ropes (8) of the mast (2) attached thereto and are movable between a stowed position lying substantially lengthways of the stowed mast (2) and an in-use position where the outriggers (3,4) extend outwards from the base (1), substantially radially of the erected mast (2), and outer ends thereof remote from the base (1) are able to contact the ground around the base (1) to support the erected mast (2) by the guy ropes (8). Each outrigger (3,4) comprises a leg (20) articulately connected at an inner end to the base (1) or to the mast (2), and a strut (21) articulately connected at an inner end to the base (1) at a distance below the inner end of the leg (20). Each strut (21) is adjustable in length such that shortening it urges a leg (20) downwards relative to the base (1) to force the outer end into contact with the ground. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; E04H 12/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/18 (2006.01); E04H 12/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 12/20 (2013.01); E04H 12/182 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003238 A1 20000524; GB 2343903 A 20000524; GB 9824589 D0 19990106; GB 9926748 D0 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020924

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI