Global Patent Index - EP 1003244 A1

EP 1003244 A1 2000-05-24 - A shielded connector and a method for connecting a shielded connector with a shielded cable

Title (en)

A shielded connector and a method for connecting a shielded connector with a shielded cable

Title (de)

Abgeschirmter Verbinder und Verfahren für die Verbindung von einem abgeschirmten Verbinder mit einem abgeschirmten Kabel

Title (fr)

Connecteur blindé et procedé pour connecter un connecteur blindé avec un câble blindé

Publication

EP 1003244 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99123130 A

Priority

  • JP 32968598 A
  • JP 33772398 A
  • JP 34193398 A

Abstract (en)

To provide a shielded connector having a short length. ÄSolutionÜ Crimping pieces 46, 47 of a shielded connector 10 are so crimped as to surround the outer surface of a folded portion 55 at an end of a shielded cable 50 in close contact therewith, and a sheath 54 is compressively deformed in radial directions due to the elasticity of the sheath 54. Since an outer crimping portion 45 squeezingly holds the folded portion 55 after crimping, an outer conductor 52 over the sheath 54 is closely held by the crimping pieces 46, 47 due to an elastic force of the sheath 54 in the folded portion 55. Thus, the folded portion 55 and the crimping pieces 46, 47 are sufficiently electrically connected and are fastened with a sufficient force. Since the outer crimping portion 45 provides sufficient electrical connection and fastening force, it is not necessary to separately provide the sheath crimping portion as in the prior art and the entire length of the shielded connector can be shortened. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05; H01R 4/18; H01R 13/646; H01R 43/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 43/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/04 (2013.01); H01R 4/184 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003244 A1 20000524; EP 1003244 B1 20050413; EP 1003244 B8 20050831; DE 69924693 D1 20050519

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69924693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091119

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69924693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AOYAMA, MASAHIKOC/O SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS LTD.

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SAITO, MASASHIC/O SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS LTD.

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KOIDE, TAKASHIC/O SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS LTD.

2004-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MATSUDA, AKIRAC/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030903

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI