Global Patent Index - EP 1003282 A2

EP 1003282 A2 2000-05-24 - Integrated circuit for processing audio signal

Title (en)

Integrated circuit for processing audio signal

Title (de)

Integrierte Schaltung zur Verarbeitung eines Audiosignals

Title (fr)

Circuit intégré de traitement de signaux audio

Publication

EP 1003282 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122312 A

Priority

JP 32652798 A

Abstract (en)

An integrated circuit for processing an audio signal includes a circuit for processing an input audio signal to create a front output signal, rear output signal and a sub-woofer output signal which are to be outputted to a front speaker, a rear speaker and a sub-woofer; and a switch for selecting the rear output signal or the sub-woofer output signal. The output from said switch is connected to a common output to the front speaker and the sub-woofer. In this configuration, the number of input/output terminals can be reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03G 3/00 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/822 (2006.01); H01L 27/04 (2006.01); H04R 5/04 (2006.01); H04S 1/00 (2006.01); H04S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 5/02 (2013.01); H04R 5/04 (2013.01); H04S 1/007 (2013.01); H04R 2420/03 (2013.01); H04R 2499/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1003282 A2 20000524; EP 1003282 A3 20060517; JP 2000152369 A 20000530; JP 3573981 B2 20041006

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080115

2007-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT NL

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060721

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H03G 3/00 20060101AFI20000222BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04S 5/02 20060101ALI20060330BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 5/04 20060101ALI20060330BHEP

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI